Bobic signed a contract as a managing director of Bulgarian club Chernomorets Burgas on 25 March 2009 and worked in the club with his former teammate Krasimir Balakov. On 27 July 2010, Bobic became new director of sport of VfB Stuttgart. On 20 January 2012, he extended his contract with VfB Stuttgart until … See more Fredi Bobic (Slovene: Fredi Bobič, born 30 October 1971) is a German football executive and former player who played as a striker. He was most recently the sporting director of Bundesliga club Hertha BSC See more Bobic was born in Maribor, SFR Yugoslavia, to a Slovene father and a Croatian mother. A few months after his birth, his parents emigrated with him to Germany and settled down first in Ditzingen, then in Stuttgart. There, he started playing football at VfR Bad Cannstatt but … See more VfB Stuttgart • DFB-Pokal: 1996–97 • UEFA Cup Winners' Cup: runner-up: 1997–98 Borussia Dortmund • Bundesliga: 2001–02 NK Rijeka See more Bobic won 37 caps (10 goals) for the Germany national team and was part of the UEFA Euro 1996 winning squad. He also played at UEFA Euro 2004, having returned to the national team in 2002 after a four-year absence. See more • Official website • Fredi Bobic at Soccerbase • Fredi Bobic at fussballdaten.de (in German) See more WebFredi Bobic has been relieved of his duties as sporting director at VfB Stuttgart, the club has confirmed.
Bundeslyga – Vikipedija
WebFredi Bobic was born on 30 October, 1971 in Maribor, Slovenia. Discover Fredi Bobic's Biography, Age, Height, Physical Stats, Dating/Affairs, Family and career... Game; Fredi Bobic. ... On 27 July 2010, he became new director of sport of VfB Stuttgart. On 20 January 2012, Bobic extended his contract with VfB Stuttgart until June 2016. Bobic ... WebJan 6, 2015 · Der Nachfolger des im September beurlaubten Fredi Bobic erhält einen Vierjahresvertrag. ... Der VfB habe «Handlungsbedarf, sonst würde er nicht dort stehen, wo er steht», sagte Dutt angesichts ... drim cuna viaje
Big City Bobic: Why Fredi Bobic looks set to swap
WebBobic signed a contract as a managing director of Bulgarian club Chernomorets Burgas on 25 March 2009 and worked in the club with his former teammate Krasimir Balakov.. On … WebOct 30, 2024 · Fredi Bobic verließ 1999 den VfB, kehrte jedoch im Jahr 2010 nach dem Ende seiner herausragenden internationalen Fußballkarriere wieder nach Bad Cannstatt zurück. Zunächst als Sportdirektor und später Vorstand Sport übernahm er beim VfB erneut große Verantwortung und konsolidierte den Verein bis 2014 in einer überaus schwierigen … WebFredi Bobic ist nicht mehr Sport-Geschäftsführer bei Hertha BSC. Die Pleite im Stadtderby gegen Union war eine zu viel für die Legende des VfB Stuttgart. 28.01.2024 ralitsa dimitrova kpmg